+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #2
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N)
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from Transportation (12-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103393D
+ − Votes (4)
February 8, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N)
February 4, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N)
January 20, 2011: Rereferred from Transportation (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor