+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0439)
On March 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 439 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1042ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (94-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Mr. Dillard agreed to
- Read third time
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Education (21-Y 2-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 4
On February 10, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 3-N)
On January 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Higher Education
On January 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 990802657
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: Reported from Education (21-Y 2-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 5-N)
February 4, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1999: Reported from Finance (14-Y 3-N)
January 28, 1999: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor