+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0140)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 140 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/14/17
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1040ER)
- Enrolled
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 17101868D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1040E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned GL&T sub: #1
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101868D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 10, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2017: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor