+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Stricken from docket by P. & E. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee:2
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (35-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 005051480
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2000: Stricken from docket by P. & E. (22-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (35-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2000: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor