+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Tabled in Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 053580800-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1039S1
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 053580800-S1
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transport. sub-committee: Moped Subcommittee
On January 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 059142800
+ − Votes (4)
February 10, 2005: Tabled in Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2005: Reported from Transportation w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor