+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105986D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1037S1
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Committee substitute printed 19105986D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
On November 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100230D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 11, 2019: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2019: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor