+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0536)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 536 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1036ER)
- Enrolled
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Charters
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Local Gov sub: Charters
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented and ordered printed 20104757D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2020: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Frank M. Ruff, Jr.
Type:
Primary Sponsor