+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0605)
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 605 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1033ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #4 Prof./Occup./Admin. (Cosgrove)
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1033S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 078669784-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 078669784-S1
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 079023784
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2007: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2007: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor