+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0760)
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 760 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1032ER)
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Del. Parrish agreed to
- Read third time
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 7, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 034416412
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2003: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2003: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor