+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 654 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1032ER)
- Enrolled
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (82-Y 13-N)
- Passed House (82-Y 13-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chair votes Yes
- Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Presented and ordered printed 20102102D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 4, 2020: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 13-N)
February 28, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
February 11, 2020: Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N)
February 11, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N)
February 3, 2020: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Ghazala F. Hashmi
Type:
Primary Sponsor