+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 3 (effective 2/13/17)
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 15, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/8/17
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1031ER)
- Enrolled
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Read third time
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 17103427D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1031E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/16 17103427D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 6, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2017: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 13, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 12, 2017: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor