+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0498)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 498 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1031ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (90-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 3-N)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Delegates: Yancey, Bell, Robert B., Gilbert, Herring
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senators: Chase, McDougle, Deeds
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendment
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
- Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N)
- Passed House with amendment (90-Y 9-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 3-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1031S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19104815D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19104815D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On October 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100144D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (11)
February 23, 2019: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
February 22, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 3-N)
February 18, 2019: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
February 13, 2019: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
February 11, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N)
February 6, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 3-N)
January 17, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor