+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
On March 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 776 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1031ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (95-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 070238784-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 070238784-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1031S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 075202784
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2007: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2007: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor