+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0026)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 26 (effective - see bill)
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 15, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 8, 2019
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1030ER)
- Enrolled
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced 19106367D-H1
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1030H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106367D-H1
- Read third time
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19106367D-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1030S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19104842D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N)
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
On October 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100983D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 6, 2019: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
January 23, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2019: Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N)
January 14, 2019: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor