+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 377 (effective 3/19/15)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0377)
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/15
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1030ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause added
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (93-Y 0-N 2-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (93-Y 0-N 2-A)
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103412D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 2015: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (93-Y 0-N 2-A)
February 18, 2015: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor