+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 514 (effective 7/1/09)
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1027ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1027S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 093578232-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 093578232-S1
On January 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 093458232
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2009: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2009: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2009: Reported from Transportation with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor