+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 31, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0336)
On March 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 336 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1027ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (26-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
On January 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (12-Y 2-N)
On January 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 996539666
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1999: Reported from General Laws (26-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
February 1, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 2-N)
January 28, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1999: Reported from General Laws (12-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor