+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0562)
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 562 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1025ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1025S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 077824784-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee amendments rejected
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 077824784-S1
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 070062105
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2007: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor