+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 18, 2025 in the House:
- Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation
On February 17, 2025 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N)
On February 13, 2025 in the House:
- Assigned CT & I sub: Communications
On February 7, 2025 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
On February 4, 2025 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
On February 3, 2025 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2025 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading) (39-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2025 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N)
On January 16, 2025 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Impact Statement from Department of Planning and Budget (SB1023)
On January 7, 2025 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-08-2025 25102968D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Vote
February 18, 2025: Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor