+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0841)
On April 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1022ER2)
On April 5, 2001 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 841 (effective 7/1/01)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 5, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (38-Y 0-N)
On March 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1022ER)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Amendment by Del. Hamilton agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 12-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (85-Y 12-N)
On February 20, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On January 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/01 014336444
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
April 5, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
April 4, 2001: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 12-N)
February 16, 2001: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2001: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor