+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 71 (effective 7/1/11)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0071)
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1020ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #3
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 11103273D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1020E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103273D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2011: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2011: Reported from Transportation with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor