+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Counties, Cities and Towns (5-Y 16-N)
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #2
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N)
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 12101228D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB102E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (8-Y 5-N 2-A)
On January 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101228D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 29, 2012: Failed to report (defeated) in Counties, Cities and Towns (5-Y 16-N)
February 6, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N)
February 2, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2012: Reported from Local Government with amendment (8-Y 5-N 2-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor