+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19105300D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100426D
+ − Votes (3)
January 24, 2019: Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor