+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Education by voice vote
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102963D
+ − Votes (4)
February 6, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2017: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor