+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0623)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 623 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1017ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 1-N 1-A)
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from Fin. (13-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102140D
+ − Votes (8)
February 15, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N)
January 30, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 1-N 1-A)
January 15, 2013: Rereferred from Fin. (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor