+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 24, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (11-Y 10-N)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1012S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105018D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19105018D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 6-N)
On July 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100066D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 2019: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (11-Y 10-N)
February 14, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
January 22, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
January 18, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor