+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0016)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 16 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1010ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N)
- Passed House (94-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100583D
+ − Votes (7)
February 11, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N)
February 8, 2011: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2011: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2011: Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2011: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor