+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On April 13, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0956)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1010ER2)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 956 (effective 7/1/99)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recom (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1010ER)
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Printed as engrossed 999090661-E
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Sen. Gartlan agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On January 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 999090661