+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 070578816-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1007S1
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 070578816-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 078411260
+ − Votes (3)
February 1, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor