+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in C. J. (19-Y 1-N)
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/03 034820500
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2003: Passed by indefinitely in C. J. (19-Y 1-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2003: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2003: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor