+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0575)
On March 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 575 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1004ER)
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 3
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (13-Y 1-N)
On January 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 993710717
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 1999: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1999: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1999: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor