+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1178)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 1178 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1003ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 20109088D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (86-Y 10-N)
- Passed House with substitute (86-Y 10-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1003H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20109088D-H1
- Read third time
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 3-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20109088D-H1
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1003S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20108067D-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20108067D-S1
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Presented and ordered printed 20104493D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
March 5, 2020: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 10-N)
March 5, 2020: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
March 2, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 3-N)
February 28, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N)
February 28, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N)
February 11, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2020: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
February 10, 2020: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
A. Benton "Ben" Chafin
Type:
Primary Sponsor