+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0435)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 435 (effective 7/1/15)
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/15
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1002ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 15105236D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105236D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1002H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15105236D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103403D