+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 215 (effective 7/1/17)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0215)
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/17/17
- Signed by President
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1001ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 17105246D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 17105246D-H1
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1001H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 17105246D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N)
On January 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101431D
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 2017: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2017: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor