+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 19-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N)
On December 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100811D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Votes (5)
January 24, 2018: Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N)
January 23, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 19-N)
January 23, 2018: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor