+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0444)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 444 (effective 4/11/10)
On March 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Technology Oversight and Government Activities
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On November 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/10 10100118D
+ − Votes (7)
March 5, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2010: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2010: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2010: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor