+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ998ER)
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 099197432
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 099197432
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor