+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 10, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ99ER)
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On January 31, 2000 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 21, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 19, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 006424936-E
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 006424936
+ − Sponsors (115)
Type:
Primary Sponsor