+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ97ER)
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: #1
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Taken up
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended HJ97E
- Printed as engrossed 10103591D-E
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103591D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2010: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2010: Reported from Rules with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor