+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ96ER)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 1-N)
- Agreed to by House (91-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102437D
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2014: Reading waived (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
February 5, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 1-N)
January 31, 2014: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor