+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ96ER)
On January 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 985696198