+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ949ER)
On February 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 058622216
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 058622216