+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 15, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ948ER)
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 058597298
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 058597298
+ − Sponsors (99)
Type:
Primary Sponsor