+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ943ER)
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up for immediate consideration
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17104966D
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor