+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ922ER)
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 11105176D
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 11105176D