+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ921ER)
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 099075606
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 099075606
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor