+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 8, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ916ER)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 058572232
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 058572232