+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ914ER)
On February 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (39-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up for immediate consideration
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 050930420
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 050930420
+ − Vote
February 11, 2005: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (135)
Type:
Primary Sponsor