+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ911ER)
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 096896524
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 096896524