+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass in Senate
- No further action taken
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 076745306
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 076745306